MA H2341 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to electronic weapons and devices. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the transparency of electronic weapons and devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3566 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2427 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4109 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - House Committee of conference membership changed (Gregoire-Fluker Oakley-Kane).
H4411 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2637 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2427 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4109 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - House Committee of conference membership changed (Gregoire-Fluker Oakley-Kane).
H4411 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2637 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2341 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2341.pdf |