MA H2354 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the display of notice to the public and first responders of the presence of motor vehicle batteries on the premises of motor vehicle repair and storage facilities. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle battery storage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2354 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2354.pdf |