MA H2359 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit carrying firearms in certain sensitive places. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To prohibit carrying firearms in sensitive places
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H1619 (Similar To) 2023-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4135 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Published as amended, see H4139
H4139 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Committee of conference appointed (Creem-Lovely-Tarr), in concurrence
H4135 (Similar To) 2023-10-18 - Published as amended, see H4139
H4139 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Committee of conference appointed (Creem-Lovely-Tarr), in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2359 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2359.pdf |