MA H237 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to smart growth housing production. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to housing production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
S2470 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H237 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H237.pdf |