MA H2501 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate expenditures for mortgages from the Community Preservation Trust Fund. Revenue.
Title
To sustain community preservation revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2644 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H1413 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2430 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1543 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S925 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1618 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S836 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1413 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2430 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1543 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S925 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1618 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S836 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2501 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2501.pdf |