MA H2556 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Higgins of Leominster, a petition of Natalie M. Higgins that the State Retirement Board be authorized to provide certain retirement benefits to Carrie Duff the surviving beneficiary of William Manduca. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the retirement benefits of the surviving beneficiary of William Manduca
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3891 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4463 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4463 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2556 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2556.pdf |