MA H2618 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement benefits for certain employees of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
To ensure fairness in retirement benefits for certain employees of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2553 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H1468 (Similar To) 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1550 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
H2553 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H1468 (Similar To) 2023-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1550 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2618 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2618.pdf |