MA H2633 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Philips of Sharon, a petition of Edward R. Philips that the State Retirement Board be authorized to grant creditable service to James Wright, an employee of the town of Sharon. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing the State Retirement Board to grant creditable service to James Wright
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Philips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2399 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3979 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H3979 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2633 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2633.pdf |