MA H2638 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to leave with pay for injuries resulting in accidental disability retirement for certain police officers and firefighters. Public Service.
Title
Relative to police officers and firefighters relative to Chapter 41, Section 111F
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1749 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
H2545 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H2683 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
S2317 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2545 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H2683 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
S2317 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2638 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2638.pdf |