MA H2773 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of “force accounts”, so-called, by awarding authorities. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the use of force accounts
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. David Muradian [R] |
Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1728 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2772 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3665
H2003 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2146 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3026 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2772 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2773 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2773.pdf |