MA H2787 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to taxation of digital advertising services. Revenue.
Title
Relative to taxation of digital advertising services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1936 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H4271 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4255 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2024 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in A-2
H4575 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
H4271 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4255 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2024 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in A-2
H4575 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2787 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2787.pdf |