MA H2842 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the corporate minimum excise tax. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the corporate minimum excise tax
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] |
Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2902 (Similar To) 2023-09-06 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1834 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S60 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2635
S1788 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S1834 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S60 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2635
S1788 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2842 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2842.pdf |