MA H2860 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for credit against taxes for the costs of certain advertising campaigns that feature digitally unaltered images of human models. Revenue.
Title
Relative to mental health promotion through realistic advertising images
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Samantha Montano [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1924 (Similar To) 2023-06-01 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H497 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4576
H497 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4576
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2860 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2860.pdf |