MA H299 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the privacy of lottery winners. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the privacy of lottery winners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2019-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H588 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3273 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3422 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
H3148 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S222 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S850 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4934
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S968 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S166 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3273 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3422 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
H3148 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S222 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S850 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4934
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S968 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S166 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H299 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H299.pdf |