MA H2994 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to discount tolls for certain motorists who participate in the fast lane toll program. Transportation.
Title
Entitling residents west of 128 to discounted access to the Massachusetts Turnpike
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4438 |
2016-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/29/2016 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4438 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H3043
H1305 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1306 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2015
H2509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2876 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2507 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1305 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1306 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2015
H2509 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2876 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2507 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2994 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2994.pdf |