MA H3028 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 432 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 432 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to membership in regional transit authorities. Transportation.
Title
Relative to membership in regional transit authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 432 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3028 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3028.pdf |