MA H3102 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to state grants for rural communities. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Advancing equity for rural communities receiving state grants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1977 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
S889 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S232 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2613
S889 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S232 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2613
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3102 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3102.pdf |