MA H3114 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mrs. Poirier of North Attleborough, a petition of Elizabeth A. Poirier that rental car companies be required to provide renters with the ability to return a vehicle anytime on a Saturday or Sunday to any rental company branch office. Transportation.
Title
Regulating rental car companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4772 |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3114 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3114.pdf |