MA H3122 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide that certain grants or contracts allow for reimbursement of indirect costs. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Enhancing the effectiveness of nonprofits’ core mission work through full cost funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2058 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2035 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2783 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1244 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2035 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2783 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1244 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3122 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3122.pdf |