MA H3145 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Blais of Deerfield, a petition of Natalie M. Blais and others that the Department of Energy Resources establish the community access to electric bicycles grant initiative. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Expanding community access to electric bicycles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2230 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3145 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3145.pdf |