MA H3185 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5126
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to a reduction in tolls for certain drivers of electric vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to toll discounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5126 |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2988 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1661 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2875 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2982 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3187 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1661 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2875 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2982 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3187 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3185 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3185.pdf |