MA H3218 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4502
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote transportation electrification infrastructure. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To promote transportation electrification infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4502 |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S354 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2614
H3932 (Similar To) 2023-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4310 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4423 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4502 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3932 (Similar To) 2023-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4310 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4423 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4502 (Replaced by) 2024-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3218 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3218.pdf |