MA H3230 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to zoning ordinances for the regulation of the installation of solar energy systems. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Allowing municipalities to reasonably regulate solar siting
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Saunders [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D] | Rep. Priscila Sousa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2164 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3230 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3230.pdf |