MA H3251 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-06 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-06 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to investments in tourism and visitation marketing and promotion. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Relative to waiving costs related to the tourism trust fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H4039 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4414 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Rejected
H4446 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Adopted
H4414 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Rejected
H4446 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3251 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3251.pdf |