MA H3288 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Consalvo of Boston, a petition of Rob Consalvo and others that the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority designate all commuter rail stations in the city of Boston as Zone 1A to promote fare equity. Transportation.
Title
Relative to fare equity
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Consalvo [D] | Rep. Jon Santiago [D] | Rep. Samantha Montano [D] | Rep. Bill MacGregor [D] |
Sen. Nick Collins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3316 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2402 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4236 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2402 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4236 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3288 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3288.pdf |