MA H3319 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the financial feasibility and department capability of extending the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority Red Line to the town of Arlington. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the extension of the red line
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4562 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2728 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2728 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3319 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3319.pdf |