MA H3327 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize sheriffs and members of sheriffs departments to issue traffic citations. Transportation.
Title
Relative to sheriff’s citations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3327 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3327.pdf |