MA H3332 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Linsky of Natick and Senator Spilka, a joint petition of David Paul Linsky and others (by vote of the town) that the town of Natick be authorized to lease the former East School for up to ninety-nine years. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Natick to allow a lease of up to ninety-nine years for the former East School
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-07-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-07-16 | House | Enacted |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-05-09 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2011-10-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3332 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13414&generalCourtId=1 |