MA H3358 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to mass incarceration. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce mass incarceration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-03JointHearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-10-01JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3306 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S826 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1052 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3340 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1651 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3379 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback