MA H3374 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Madaro of Boston, a petition of Adrian C. Madaro and Michelle M. DuBois that the Massachusetts Port Authority prepare and publish a strategy report containing policies with respect to the assessment and management of the current and future quality of air and noise levels in the East Boston section of the city of Boston. Transportation.
Title
Improving air quality in airport environmental justice communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3374 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3374.pdf |