MA H338 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4479
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the return of health clubs fees to members who become physically or medically disabled. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to fees at health clubs
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4479 |
2024-02-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S126 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S123 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied H213
H4479 (Replaced by) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S123 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied H213
H4479 (Replaced by) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H338 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H338.pdf |