MA H3431 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mrs. Poirier of North Attleborough and Senator Timilty, joint petition of Elizabeth A. Poirier and others that the town of Norton be authorized to grant certain easements and restrictions over certain town-owned land. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Norton to grant easements and restrictions over certain town-owned land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor - Roll Call #146 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 0] |
2012-02-08 | House | Enacted - 155 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 190) |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-09-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-09-16 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-09-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-08-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-08-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-08-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-07-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-05-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3431 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14989&generalCourtId=1 |