MA H3488 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reimbursement of cities and towns for veterans' benefits. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Providing for timely reimbursement of cities and towns for veterans' benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Richard Haggerty [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Rep. Rodney Elliott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2311 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
S1321 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S1321 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3488 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3488.pdf |