MA H3504 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4616
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to limit motor vehicle dealer documentation fees. Transportation.
Title
Limiting motor vehicle dealer documentation fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4616 |
2021-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S183 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H407 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S239 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4616 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H407 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S239 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4616 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3504 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3504.pdf |