MA H3566 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4464
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include licensed rehabilitation counselors in the definition of licensed mental health professionals. Financial Services
Title
Improving access to rehabilitation counseling
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Rep. George Ross [R] | Rep. Ronald Mariano [D] | Rep. Christine Canavan [D] |
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4464 |
2011-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-07-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-05-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2011-04-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4464 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3566 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15012&generalCourtId=1 |