MA H3595 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4618
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to autonomous vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to autonomous vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4618 |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2273 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied S1402
H4618 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4618 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3595 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3595.pdf |