MA H3606 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-18 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-18 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of the term physician. Public Health.
Title
Relative to health care transparency
Sponsors
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. William Galvin [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] |
Rep. Andres Vargas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1348 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3606 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3606.pdf |