MA H3633 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to lead pipe safety. Public Health.
Title
Relative to lead pipe safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4002 (Similar To) 2023-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2514 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
S2720 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4546 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2514 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
S2720 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4546 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3633 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3633.pdf |