MA H3690 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the bottle bill to include any drinkable liquid intended for human oral consumption. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To expand the bottle bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2104 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3690 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3690.pdf |