MA H3729 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3995
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3995
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3995
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Wakefield be authorized to convey an easement in said town to the Wakefield Municipal Gas and Light Department. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Permitting the town of Wakefield to convey an easement to the Wakefield Municipal Gas & Light Department
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-17 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3995 |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3807 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Signed by the Lieutenant Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2023
H3995 (Replaced by) 2023-08-17 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4062
H4062 (Similar To) 2023-11-22 - Signed by the , Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2023
H3995 (Replaced by) 2023-08-17 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4062
H4062 (Similar To) 2023-11-22 - Signed by the , Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3729 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3729.pdf |