MA H3745 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Somerville be authorized to impose municipal reviews on institutional master plans of certain institutional facilities. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Granting the city of Somerville the authority to require the adoption of institutional master plans subject to the review and approval by the municipality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4074 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
S2545 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H4465 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2545 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H4465 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3745 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3745.pdf |