MA H3775 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reorganize the Lexington Housing Assistance Board, Inc. in the town of Lexington. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Reorganizing the Lexington Housing Assistance Board, Inc
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-12-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-11-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-10-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2023-04-12 | House | Returned from the Secretary of State |
2023-03-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
Same As/Similar To
H668 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2740 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3704 (Similar To) 2024-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4160 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2024
H4223 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2740 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3704 (Similar To) 2024-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4160 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2024
H4223 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3775 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3775.pdf |