MA H3851 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1610
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the Brownfields tax credit
Title
To extend the Brownfields tax credit
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-08-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-08-03 | House | New draft of S1610, S1611 and H1627 |
2017-08-03 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1947 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1105 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2646 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1610 (Replaces) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H2314 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1105 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2646 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1610 (Replaces) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H2314 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3851 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3851.pdf |