MA H3966 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 318 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 318 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Plymouth be authorized to repeal a certain act authorizing said town to lease certain land. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Further regulating the lease of a certain parcel of land in the town of Plymouth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 318 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-11-10 | House | Enacted |
2016-11-07 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-11-07 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-21 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-07-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-04-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-04-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-03-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-03-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/15/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3298 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2629 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1501 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2902 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1751 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
H2629 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1501 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2902 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1751 (Similar To) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4604
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3966 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3966.pdf |