MA H4012 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Eastham be authorized to convey a conservation restriction on a certain parcel of land to the Eastham Conservation Foundation, Inc. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Eastham, acting by and through its board of selectmen, to convey a conservation restriction on a certain parcel of land to the Eastham conservation foundation, inc
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-01-16 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2023-12-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-12-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-12-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-11-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-07-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-07-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2097 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4012 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4012.pdf |