MA H4049 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the preparation of bilingual ballots in English and Haitian Creole for state elections in the city known as the town of Randolph. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the preparation of bilingual ballots in English and Haitian Creole in the city known as the town of Randolph
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-11-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-08-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-08-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
2023-07-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1738 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4049 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4049.pdf |