MA H405 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the charter school reimbursement rate for the town of Foxborough. Education. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the charter school reimbursement rate for the town of Foxborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H138 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4236
H467 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H547 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H411 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1191 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H467 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H547 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H411 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1191 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H405 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H405.pdf |