MA H4105 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Nantucket be authorized to issue pension obligation bonds or notes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing Nantucket to issue pension obligation bonds or notes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-10-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-09-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4104 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4360
H3792 (Similar To) 2022-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 348 of the Acts of 2022
S512 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4123 (Similar To) 2022-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2022
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3792 (Similar To) 2022-12-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 348 of the Acts of 2022
S512 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4123 (Similar To) 2022-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2022
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4203 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4105 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4105.pdf |