MA H4158 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to trainings for employees of the town of Lanesborough. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the town of Lanesborough employee training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-01-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-01-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-12-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-11-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2130 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4158 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4158.pdf |