MA H4237 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter of the town of Wrentham. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Approving the town of Wrentham home rule charter as amended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-03-28 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-03-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-02 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4061 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2024
H3717 (Similar To) 2023-08-17 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4061
S2523 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3997 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2024
H4509 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3717 (Similar To) 2023-08-17 - Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4061
S2523 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3997 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2024
H4509 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4237 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4237.pdf |